judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6211
A-6211
02/06/1957
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY
ORAL VERA DILLARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/05/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/03/1957Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
03/07/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
02/06/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/05/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/20/1957Dissenting opinion issued.
11/20/1957Opinion issued
04/03/1957Brief on the Merits
03/07/1957Response to Petition
02/27/1957Document received (See Remarks)
02/06/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/06/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Prudential Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Oral Vera DillardRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information