judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6237
A-6237
02/26/1957
Application for Writ of Error
LONE STAR GAS COMPANY
JAMES W. TOMLIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/24/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/22/1957Supplement to ResponseRespondent
05/13/1957Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
04/17/1957Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
04/15/1957Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/15/1957Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/12/1957Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/07/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
02/26/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/30/1957Response to Motion filed
07/24/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/10/1957Dissenting opinion issued.
07/10/1957Opinion issued
05/22/1957Supplement to Response
05/13/1957Supplemental Brief filed
04/17/1957Brief on the Merits
04/15/1957Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/15/1957Supplemental Brief filed
04/12/1957Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/20/1957Document received (See Remarks)
03/07/1957Response to Petition
02/26/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/26/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Eldon R. VaughanAmicus Curiae
LONE STAR GAS COMPANYPetitioner
Leonards, of Fort Worth, TexasAmicus Curiae
James W. TomlinRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information