Case: A-6229
A-6229
02/15/1957
MISC PETITION
DR. JOHN E. KEE
DR. W. F. BABER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/12/1957 | Motion for Rehearing | Intervenor | | |
05/28/1957 | Supplemental Brief filed | Intervenor | | |
05/21/1957 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
04/26/1957 | Appendix Filed | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/26/1957 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/17/1957 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/15/1957 | Brief on the Merits | Intervenor | | |
04/13/1957 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/12/1957 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
04/11/1957 | Appellees' Brief filed | | ||
04/03/1957 | Appellant's Brief filed | | ||
02/15/1957 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/13/1957 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/12/1957 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
05/29/1957 | Opinion issued | | ||
05/28/1957 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
05/21/1957 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | | ||
04/26/1957 | Appendix Filed | | ||
04/26/1957 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/17/1957 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/15/1957 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
04/13/1957 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/12/1957 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
04/12/1957 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
04/11/1957 | Appellees' Brief filed | | ||
04/03/1957 | Appellant's Brief filed | | ||
03/13/1957 | Letter Filed | | ||
02/15/1957 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Dr. Robert K. Shannon, Dr. Ellie Carp and Dr. Stanley C. Pearie | Intervenor | |
James E. Irion | Amicus Curiae | |
Dr. W. F. Baber, et al. | Appellee | |
Northwest Texas Optometric Society | Amicus Curiae | |
Texas Optometric Association | Amicus Curiae | |
North Texas Optometric Society | Amicus Curiae | |
Dr. John E. Kee | Appellant |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information