judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6230
A-6230
02/19/1957
Application for Writ of Error
KORK KELLEY DBA KORKELE ENGINEERING PRODUCTION COMPANY
BLUFF CREEK OIL COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/23/1958Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/09/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
02/19/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/31/1958Response to Motion filed
01/23/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/08/1958Dissenting opinion issued.
01/08/1958Opinion issued
04/24/1957Document received (See Remarks)
04/24/1957Document received (See Remarks)
03/09/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/19/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/19/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bluff Creek Oil Company, et al.Respondent
Kork Kelley dba Korkele Engineering Production CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information