judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BENTLY NEVADA VS. STASIAK

Case Information: 34881
Short Caption:BENTLY NEVADA VS. STASIAKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - CV9800993AClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/1999 / Recanzone, MarioSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/05/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from McDonald Carano Wilson McCune Bergin Frankovich & Hicks--check no. 0023012.
09/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09144
09/30/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Mario G. Recanzone. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/04/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-00112
01/21/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-00975
02/07/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-01950
02/07/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-01951
03/15/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. re: entire transcript of proceedings. 00-04064
05/19/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 5/19/00 (Reno/Carson). 00-08442
05/19/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 5. 00-08443
06/19/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 6/19/00. 00-10494
07/18/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 18, 2000. 00-12435
08/18/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 8/18/00 (Reno/Carson). 00-14545
08/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-15041
08/28/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/05/2001Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Panel: NNP02-MS/RR/NB.
11/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-18883
12/11/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19481
12/11/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 12, 2001. 01-19481