judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6249
A-6249
03/07/1957
Application for Writ of Error
RAYMOND MITCHELL, ET AL.
LEON MITCHELL AND VIC MITCHELL, MARY PROPHET. ET AL., LAMAR MITCHELL, BILL MITCHELL AND ALFRED COMIER, CORNELIUS MITCHELL, ET AL., LEON MITCHELL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/29/1957Response to Brief filedPetitioner
05/16/1957Brief on the MeritsRespondent
04/10/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/01/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
04/01/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
03/29/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
03/07/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
03/07/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/19/1957Opinion issued
05/29/1957Response to Brief filed
05/27/1957Miscellaneous letter
05/16/1957Brief on the Merits
04/24/1957Document received (See Remarks)
04/24/1957Document received (See Remarks)
04/24/1957Document received (See Remarks)
04/10/1957Reply to Response
04/01/1957Response to Petition
04/01/1957Response to Petition
03/29/1957Response to Petition
03/07/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/07/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/07/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Leon Mitchell and Vic MitchellRespondent
Raymond Mitchell, et al.Petitioner
Leon Mitchell, et al.Respondent
Cornelius Mitchell, et al.Respondent
Mary Prophet. et al.Respondent
Lamar Mitchell, Bill Mitchell and Alfred ComierRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information