judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BEYNON VS. BEYNON

Case Information: 34882
Short Caption:BEYNON VS. BEYNONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D239562Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Stanley W. Pierce--check no. 33121.
09/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09153
09/30/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/04/1999Other Other. Returned, unfiled, with letter, Docketing Statement Civil Appeals and Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (Not required per NRAP 16; docketing statement on old form.)
11/15/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. August 16, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. 99-11284
11/29/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 99-11880
12/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-12299
01/13/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file a docketing statement and a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request. Upon the filing of the docketing statement , this court shall conduct a jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 70 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Fn1[On Novemer 15, 1999, court reporter Deborah Casper filed a certified copy of a transcript conducted on August 16, 1999. If no additional transcripts are to be prepared and filed, appellant shall file and serve a certificate of no transcript request. Otherwise, appellant shall file and serve a transcript request form. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-00605
01/27/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Regarding appellant James Beynon, has instructed attorney Stanley W. Pierce not to do anything further on this appeal. 00-01365
02/07/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Change of Address for Joseph Houston. 00-01948
03/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, inform this court whether he intends to proceed with this appeal or simply desires to substitute counsel. Failure to respond to this order in a timely manner may result in the immediate dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. fn1[Attorney Pierce shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, serve a copy of this order on appellant and provide proof of service to the clerk of this court.] 00-04536
03/31/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (March 27, 2000 Order). 00-05231
04/06/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-05561
04/07/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from Attorney Stanley W. Pierce in Response to this Court's Order filed on 03/22/00. 00-05614
04/10/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Motion to Dismiss Appeal). 00-05697
04/17/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Order filed 3/22/00). 00-06135
05/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On April 6, 2000, respondent filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. On April 10, 2000, appellant's counsel filed with this court a certificate of mailing stating that on April 6, 2000, appellant's counsel mailed copies of respondent's motion to dismiss this appel to each of two mailing addresses for appellant. To date, appellant has not complied with this court's order of March 22, 2000, or otherwise communicated with this court. Appellant has also failed to respond to respondent's April 6, 2000, motion to dismiss this appeal. We grant respondent's unopposed motion and " . . . dismiss this appeal." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-08199
06/13/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-09936
06/13/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 21, 2000. 00-09936