judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT PAUL PARRIS v. JAMIE SUE PARRIS

Case Heading (S-08-0247)
Case Number:S-08-0247Case Docketed On:11/19/2008
Linked To: S-08-0248
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:ROBERT PAUL PARRIS v. JAMIE SUE PARRIS
Full Title:ROBERT PAUL PARRIS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JAMIE SUE PARRIS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert Paul ParrisDaniel E. White
AppelleeJamie Sue ParrisMary T. Parsons

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 44
Citation:204 P.3d 298

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/19/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (Letter dated 11/14/08, postmarked 11/18/08)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/19/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/21/2008Motion - Stay - otherMotionStay - otherFinal
11/21/2008Event - Hardcopy received Motion to Stay Execution Pending AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/03/2008Motion - Stay briefing - opposedMotionStay briefing - opposedFinal
12/03/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion for stay of briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/09/2008Order - Denying Motion for Stay of Execution Pending AppealOrderDenyFinal
12/30/2008Order - Denying Motion for Stay of Briefing ScheduleOrderDenyFinal
01/06/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/30/2009Event - Phone Call - to District Court Clerk re W.R.C.P. 60(b) motion, no order has been entered as of this dateEventPhone CallFinal
02/17/2009Event - Phone Call - Spoke with Diane at District Court. There was a hearing on this case on February 12, 2009 - but no order yet.EventPhone CallFinal
02/20/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/25/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/09/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/11/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/23/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, six volumes. Volumes I-V, Original Papers; Volume VI, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/30/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
03/30/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/15/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/15/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/20/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/15/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal