judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDRE L. BARKSDALE SR. V. EAGLE MAINTENANCE SERVICES INC.

Case Information: 10-AA-1426
Short Caption:ANDRE L. BARKSDALE SR. V. EAGLE MAINTENANCE SERVICES INC.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01980-10Filed Date:11/18/2010

Opening Event Date:11/18/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/17/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAndre L. Barksdale, Sr.YPro SeN
RespondentEagle Maintenance Services IncorporatedN
Samuel C. HamiltonNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/18/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
11/18/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
12/02/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to November 18, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
12/02/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
01/07/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 2, 2010, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
01/25/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/9/28/10 hearing
01/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/28/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
02/03/2011APPEARANCE - of Samuel C. Hamilton on behalf respondent
03/18/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 28, 2011, directing petitioner to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of petitioner and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
04/25/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 18, 2011, directing petitioner to submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that petitioner has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this petition for review is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
04/25/2011DISMISSED
05/17/2011MANDATE ISSUED