judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MEYER VS. SUNRISE HOSPITAL

Case Information: 31781
Short Caption:MEYER VS. SUNRISE HOSPITALCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A354558Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:02/18/1998 / Goldberg, AubreySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/30/2000 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/30/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/05/1998Other Other. Filing Fee Due.
02/05/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
02/05/1998OtherDisqualification of Justice Shearing. Voluntary recusal of Justice Shearing from this matter. (Law firm of Hale Lane Peek) JUSTICE SHEARING IS NO LONGER DISQUALIFIED - SEE 12/20/99 DOCKET ENTRY.
02/13/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due date: 10 days.
02/18/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Aubrey Goldberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/20/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
02/20/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Hale, Lane-check no. 028612.
03/02/1998Other Other. Filed Response to Docketing Statement.
03/25/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
04/22/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file with this court a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request and 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
05/08/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn.
08/20/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant shall have to and including September 20, 1998, to file the Opening Brief.
09/18/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief.
09/21/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed September 18, 1998, is granted. The appellant's opening brief shall be served and filed on or before September 30, 1998.
09/30/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: hand delivered 9/30/98).
09/30/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix, Volumes I, II and III. (Received original and two copies).
11/30/1998MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Respondent shall have to and including December 10, 1998, to file the Answering Brief.
12/10/1998BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 12/10/98).
01/07/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant may have to and including February 10, 1999, within which to file the reply brief.
02/09/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for 14 day Extension to File Reply Brief.
02/11/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Reply brief shall be served and filed on or before February 24, 1999.
02/24/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 2/24/99).
08/20/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address (Earley & Savage).
12/20/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Re: Justice Disqualification. Justice Shearing is no longer disqualified and will be participating in the decision of this appeal.
02/02/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for March 30, 2000 at the hour of 11:00 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Carson City. (En Banc) 00-01646
03/15/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-04092
03/30/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. RR/CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB
05/15/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. 'Affirmed.' fn6[Without cross-appealing and without requesting attorney fees before the district court, the hospital asks this court to award it attorney fees. We do not reach the issue of whether attorney fees are proper because this court lacks jurisdiction to hear the claim.] fn7[The Honorable Myron E. Leavitt, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. By the Court, Becker, J. We concur: Young, J. and Agosti, J. Maupin, C.J., concurring. Shearing J., with whom Rose, J., agrees, concurring. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 31. En Banc 01-08049
05/21/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Nancy Savage and S. Brent Vogel requesting that their names appear on the Opinion filed 5/15/01. 01-08441
06/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08089
06/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2001. 01-08089