judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHERIFF VS. MARCUS (RICHARD ALAN)

Case Information: 32958
Short Caption:SHERIFF VS. MARCUS (RICHARD ALAN)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR981711Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/14/1999 at 8:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/03/1998OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Justice Agosti disqualified from participation in this matter. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/03/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/03/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
09/08/1998Other Other. Mailed out corrected receipt - this is a fast track appeal. (Fast track notice mailed to all counsel).
09/15/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Amended Notice of Appeal. (No action required per AH.)
09/17/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified Copy of Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson.
09/22/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
09/22/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Existence of Question Concerning Validity of a Statute.
09/30/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.
09/30/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix.
10/20/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Pursuant to telephonic request of October 20, 1998, the fast track response shall be served and filed on or before October 27, 1998.
10/21/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.
04/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellants counsel shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, either file a copy of the December 18, 1997 transcripts with the clerk of this court or file a rough draft transcript request form with the district court. Additionally, counsel for appellant shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file a supplemental appendix. Failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions.
05/03/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Transcript of Proceedings for December 18, 1997. Court Reporter: Cecily Krawczyk.
05/03/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Supplemental Appendix.
05/03/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Compliance.
05/18/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. The appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 20 days after the date of this order. Fn2[We hereby suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript in this appeal]. The answering brief shall be served and filed within 20 days after service of the appellant's opening brief. After service of the respondent's brief, the appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed within 15 days. Fn3[The clerk is directed to correct the docket sheet in this matter to reflect the caption as stated above]. (Docket sheet and case cards corrected).
06/08/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 6/7/99).
06/24/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 6/23/99).
07/13/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 7/12/99).
10/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, December 14, 1999 at the hour of 8:30 a.m. - 1/2 hour in Carson City. (NNP-RR, CY, ML)
11/29/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
12/14/1999Other Other. Oral Argument before the Northern Nevada Panel: submitted. NNP99B-RR/CY/ML
02/23/2000Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed." Before Rose, C.J., Young and Leavitt, JJ. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. NNP99B-RR/CY/ML 00-02810
03/21/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-04455
03/21/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/30/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 27, 2000. 00-04455