judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: CHUKWUJINDU VICTOR MBAKPUO

Case Information: 10-BG-1391
Short Caption:IN RE: CHUKWUJINDU VICTOR MBAKPUOClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Committee On Admissions
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:11/09/2010

Opening Event Date:11/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerChukwujindu Victor Mbakpuo NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Committee on AdmissionsN
Mark S. Carlin NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/09/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
11/09/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
11/10/2010RECEIVED petitioner's supplement to petition.
11/18/2010ORDER On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that this matter is referred to the Committee on Admissions for its recommendation as to whether the relief sought by the petitioner should be afforded by this court. (JC)
12/03/2010REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF COMM. ON ADMISSIONS that the petition be denied.
12/15/2010PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to the Committee's response and recommendation. Petitioner's request for hearing.
01/19/2011FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
01/19/2011DENIED On consideration of petitioner's petition for review requesting that the court revive and renew petitioner's application filed in 1997, so as to allow the petitioner the opportunity to establish that he currently possesses the character and fitness required for admission to the District of Columbia Bar, petitioner's supplement to petition for review, response and recommendation of the Committee on Admissions, and petitioner's reply, it is ORDERED that the petition for review is denied. (RZ,FI,KG)
01/28/2011PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC AND ORAL ARGUMENT
03/30/2011ORDER DENYING RESP PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC ORDERED that the motion for oral argument is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the petition for rehearing en banc is denied. (WH,RZ,RD,GL,KR,FI,BR,TH,OB)
04/28/2011RECEIVED from the Supreme Court of the United States notification that respondent filed a petition for writ of certiorari on April 25, 2011, and placed on the docket April 25, 2011 as No. 10-10150.
06/16/2011RECEIVED a letter from the Supreme Court of the United Sates, Office of the Clerk, advising the court that the Supreme Court entered an order on June 13, 2011, denying the petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner has until July 5, 2011, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38 (a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of tthis court. William Suter, Clerk
10/03/2011FiledOrder Denying the petition for writ of certiorari in the Supreme Court of the United States
10/14/2011FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Petitioner)