judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ASKINS (LLOYD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33207
Short Caption:ASKINS (LLOYD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36568 , 45535
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR980574Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/13/1999 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/21/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
10/21/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
11/02/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporters: Court Reporters: R. Walker and L. Bahr.
11/04/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
11/20/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Filed certified copy of Transcipt of Proceedings. Jury Proceedings 9/17/98. Court Reporter: Lee M. Bahr.
01/11/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Filed Transcript of Proceedings: 9/14/98; 9/15/98,9/16/98, and 9/18/98. Court Reporter: Randi Lee Walker.
02/19/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Stipulation and Order that appellant may have to and including March 22, 1999, within which to file the opening brief.
03/23/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extenstion of time to File Opening Brief.
03/24/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Filed Affidavit of Mailing
03/29/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The motion filed March 23, 1999, is granted. Appellant shall, on or before April 21, 1999, serve and file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
04/22/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
04/22/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Filed Joint Appendix.
05/14/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on 5/13/99).
06/15/1999BriefFiled Brief. Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 6/14/99)
10/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for Monday, December 13, 1999 at the hour of 9:30 a.m. - 1/2 hour in Carson City. (NNP-CY, DA, ML)
11/29/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
12/10/1999Other Other. Oral Argument before the Northern Nevada Panel: Submitted. NNP99B- CY/DA/ML
01/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we vacate the sentence imposed and remand for a new penalty hearing in accordance with this order." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-01259
02/23/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-02839
02/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 28, 2000. 00-02839