judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WESLEY M. WHITE and CAROLE A. KENNEY v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION and HAROLD DWAIN CAREY

Case Heading (S-08-0224)
Case Number:S-08-0224Case Docketed On:10/08/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:WESLEY M. WHITE and CAROLE A. KENNEY v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION and HAROLD DWAIN CAREY
Full Title:WESLEY M. WHITE and CAROLE A. KENNEY, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION and HAROLD DWAIN CAREY, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWesley M. WhiteBernard Q. Phelan
AppellantCarole A. KenneyBernard Q. Phelan
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Theodore R. Racines
AppelleeHarold Dwain CareyBruce A. Salzburg
Theodore R. Racines

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure
Opinion Number:2009 WY 90
Citation:210 P.3d 1096

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/08/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/08/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/25/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/09/2009Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
01/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/20/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/02/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/06/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/03/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
07/10/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/28/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/28/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/31/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/29/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal