judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ADRIAN J. MCCRAE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1409
Short Caption:ADRIAN J. MCCRAE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL8789-99Filed Date:11/08/2010

Opening Event Date:11/08/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/27/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/18/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/24/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAdrian J. Mccrae Y
James Benny Jones YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Sean M. Lewis YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (By: JAC)
01/03/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (31pgs/Tape) 5/5/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (41pgs/Tape) 7/16/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (44pgs/Tape) 7/23/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (19pgs/Tape) 10/8/10 proc. w/CD
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/25/2011RECORD INDEX
01/25/2011RECORD COPIES
02/17/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 45 days.
03/11/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to the extent that the brief of appellant shall and the appendix shall be filed within 15 days from the date of this order. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
03/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION of its previous Motion to Enlarge Time to File Brief
04/25/2011ORDER GRANT APPELLANT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION of this court's order is granted and appellant's brief and limited appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
05/27/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief w/Appendix attached (MOLV needed to file out of time - attorney notified by phone)
05/31/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
06/27/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
06/28/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days.
07/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief
07/27/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/27/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/26/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/18/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Thompson, Belson
02/02/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge)
02/24/2012FiledMandate