judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEIFER VS. KEIFER

Case Information: 32906
Short Caption:KEIFER VS. KEIFERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9802023Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1998 / Klasic, DonaldSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/18/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Filing fee of $200. (John Ohlson--check no. 3424).
08/27/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
09/03/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Donald F. Klasic. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/03/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
09/18/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Substitution of Attorneys.
09/23/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Mailed copy of Substitution of Attorneys to Settlement Judge Klasic.
11/02/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
11/17/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request, and shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
02/23/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (mailed on: 02/22/99).
03/17/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 3/17/99).
03/17/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 3/17/99).
04/15/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent shall have to and including April 23, 1999, to file the Answering Brief.
04/23/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent shall have to and including April 27, 1999, to file the Answering Brief.
04/28/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 4/27/99).
05/26/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 5/26/99).
11/18/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.
11/18/1999Other Other. Case submitted on the briefs to the Northern Nevada Panel this day. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML.
11/18/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/25/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML.
02/02/2000Other Other. Filed Respondent's Verified Memorandum of Costs.
02/23/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $29.98. 00-02901
02/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 28, 2000. 00-02901