judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN MICHAEL SIMMONS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0223)
Case Number:S-08-0223Case Docketed On:10/06/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:JOHN MICHAEL SIMMONS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOHN MICHAEL SIMMONS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn Michael Simmons Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Credit for Time Served
Opinion Number:2009 WY 68
Citation:208 P.3d 1315 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/06/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/24/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/02/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and copy of Designation of Record on Appeal (Received untimely)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/12/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/23/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/30/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/03/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
05/28/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/15/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/18/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal