judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

OLIVER M. BOLING V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1408
Short Caption:OLIVER M. BOLING V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL335-84Filed Date:11/08/2010

Opening Event Date:11/08/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/04/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/15/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOliver M. Boling YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/19/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 8, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
12/07/2010RECORD INDEX
12/07/2010RECORD COPIES
12/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/21/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (CASTILLO)
01/28/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/28/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
03/04/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/04/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/10/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
03/21/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
08/12/2011FiledMotion To Appoint Counsel and for Oral Argument (Appellant)
09/06/2011FiledOrder Denying pro se aplt motion requesting to present oral argument & appt. of counsel.
09/15/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Thompson, Nebeker, Pryor
09/15/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson, Pryor and Nebeker)
10/07/2011FiledMandate
10/19/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc or Initial Hearing En Banc pursuant to Rule 40. (Appellant)
12/09/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se pet for reh/reh en banc