judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEON RICHARDSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1407
Short Caption:LEON RICHARDSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL6010-95Filed Date:11/02/2010

Opening Event Date:11/02/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeon Richardson YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Amanda J. Winchester NN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/02/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/16/2010RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief and Appendix (Titled as: Appeal of the Trial Court's October 19, 2010 denying Petitioner's Pro Se Motion to Vacate or Correct and Illegal Sentence . . .) (Served by DCCA)
11/19/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 2, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
12/07/2010RECORD INDEX
12/07/2010RECORD COPIES
12/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/27/2010ORDERED: That the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
12/27/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
01/25/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
01/26/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo - appellant's brief/appendix
02/18/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance.
03/14/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED as the trial court did not err in denying appellant's motion to correct an illegal sentence...SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
03/14/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal be and hereby is AFFIRMED. (RDKRTE) (rl)
04/06/2011MANDATE ISSUED