judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FOSTER (TROY ANTHONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32872
Short Caption:FOSTER (TROY ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42749 , 65592
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR980120Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/13/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/21/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
08/21/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Filed Notice of Deficiency in Notice of Appeal.
10/22/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Filed Order of Remand for Designation of Counsel. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from the appointment or appearance of counsel, the district court shall: (1) transmit to this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to enter an appearance with this court. fn1[All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required, under this order, to enter an appearance in this court.]
11/09/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Filed Notice of Appearance. The Washoe County Public Defender's Office has been appointed to represent Appellant. Troy Anthony Foster. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
11/16/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
11/16/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings requested: 4/27/98--C. Hummel; 4/28/98--W. Pearson; 4/29/98--E. Luschar; 4/30/98--C. Eisenberg; 5/1/98--W. Pearson; 5/2/98--S. Zolkowski and W. Pearson.
12/01/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Filed Transcript of Proceeding. May 2, 1998 proceeding. Court Reporter: Stephanie Zolkowski.
12/21/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Filed certified copy of Transcript of Proceedings dated: May 1, 1998 and May 2, 1998. Court Reporter: Wendy L. Pearson.
12/23/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Filed Certified Copy of Transcript of Proceedings. 4/29/98--Erin T. Luschar and 4/30/98--Constance S. Eisenberg.
03/09/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant shall have to and including April 8, 1999, to file the Opening Brief.
04/12/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.
04/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time, to and including May 10, 1999, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. We do not expect further requests for extensions of time absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances.
05/11/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 5/10/99).
05/11/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix.
06/11/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 6/10/99).
06/11/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Supplemental Appendix.
07/12/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant may have to and including August 11, 1999, within which to file the reply brief.
08/11/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 8/10/99).
12/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.
12/13/1999Other Other. Case submitted on the briefs this day to the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML.
12/13/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML.
02/23/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-02881
02/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/09/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 28, 2000. 00-02881
03/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 26, 2000, this court entered an order dismissing this appeal. On February 14, 2000, appellant submitted a proper person motion. While appellant has neither sought nor been granted leave to file documents in proper person, we direct the clerk to file the February 14, 2000, submission. No good cause appearing, we deny appellant's proper person motion and requests for relief. 00-03784
03/10/2000MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Removal of Attorney of Record and Motion for Stay of Remittitur. 00-02299