judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FIRST NATIONAL BANK IN DALLAS, INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF MURRAY SAMUELL, DECEASED v. S. M. ZIMMERMAN, WILLIAM C. HULS AND A. P. SCOTT

Case: B-1366
B-1366
02/07/1969
Application for Writ of Error
FIRST NATIONAL BANK IN DALLAS, INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF MURRAY SAMUELL, DECEASED
S. M. ZIMMERMAN, WILLIAM C. HULS AND A. P. SCOTT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/26/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/13/1969Response to Brief filedPetitioner
05/07/1969Post submission brief filedRespondent
04/14/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/21/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
02/07/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/02/1969Response to Motion filed
06/26/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/11/1969Opinion issued
05/13/1969Response to Brief filed
05/07/1969Post submission brief filed
04/14/1969Reply to Response
03/05/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/05/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/05/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/05/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/05/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/21/1969Response to Petition
02/07/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/07/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
S. M. Zimmerman, William C. Huls and A. P. ScottRespondent
First National Bank in Dallas, Independent Executor of the Estate of Murray Samuell, deceasedPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information