judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CUNNINGHAM (JERALD) VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34858
Short Caption:CUNNINGHAM (JERALD) VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/21/1999Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandate to Compell the First Judicial District Court to Enforce this Courts Order dated June 9, 1999 in Case No. 34181 that the State of Nevada in the Real Party in Interest of the States Presentment Order entered for Lack of Probable Cause Facts in Case No. D-453-1982 by Judge Ray Justices Court Order of the State of Nevada Presentment Process. 99-08935
10/25/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny this petition." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-10390
11/18/1999Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11445
12/06/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-12168
12/06/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.