judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARY LEE BELDEN v. ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director, Wyoming Department of Corrections, in his person as Director of Wyoming Out of State Prisoners

Case Heading (S-10-0237)
Case Number:S-10-0237Case Docketed On:11/03/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Civil Rights Sec. 1983
Short Title:GARY LEE BELDEN v. ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director, Wyoming Department of Corrections, in his person as Director of Wyoming Out of State Prisoners
Full Title:GARY LEE BELDEN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director, Wyoming Department of Corrections, in his person as Director of Wyoming Out of State Prisoners, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGary Lee Belden Pro Se
AppelleeRobert O. LampertBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Misha Westby

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law
Opinion Number:2011 WY 83
Citation:251 P.3d 325

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/03/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/03/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (case not docketed until fee received)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/03/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/18/2010Brief - Appellant - Certificate of Service was left blank, due date for brief posted from date brief was actually mailedBriefAppellantFinal
12/27/2010Event - Other - AG's office brought in record indicating that it had not been numbered or indexed. Contacted clerk of district court and advised that the record will be returned for indexing.EventOtherFinal
12/27/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellee.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee/Defendant's motion for extension of time to file response brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/29/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/07/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Response Brief of Appellee/DefendantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/18/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/24/2011Brief - Appellant reply (Memorandum Response)BriefAppellant replyFinal
01/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/27/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/04/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/04/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
05/03/2011Correspondence - Incoming from Mr. Belden regarding status of case and his address.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/03/2011Correspondence - Outgoing - Letter to Mr. Belden advising his case is still under advisement and that we have changed his address.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
05/24/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/09/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/09/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/13/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/10/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal