judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRANCE N. HUDSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1398
Short Caption:TERRANCE N. HUDSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-3426-10Filed Date:11/05/2010

Opening Event Date:11/05/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/21/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/10/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerrance N. Hudson Y
George E. RickmanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Leslie Ann Gerardo YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/05/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/22/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that George Rickman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
11/22/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) George Rickman, Esquire
01/05/2011 On consideration of this court's order of November 22, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
01/07/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (unopposed)(Titled as: Motion to Enlarge Time to File Statement Regarding Transcript)
01/07/2011RECEIVED - Statement Regarding Transcript
01/13/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (Castillo)
01/13/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
02/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (8 pgs/tape) 7/20/10 proc.
02/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (6 pgs/tape) 8/5/10 proc.
02/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (140 pgs/McCarn) 8/5/10 proc.
02/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (218 pgs/Armstrong) 8/9-10/10 proc. w/cd
02/01/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/04/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/08/2011RECORD INDEX
02/08/2011RECORD COPIES
02/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (SEALED pleadings)
03/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 60 days. no oppo
03/28/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 25, 2011. (JAC)
04/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 3, 2011 (unopposed)
05/03/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Brief (maxb still pend).
05/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, and the lodged appellant's brief and appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted to the extent that the lodged appellant's brief and appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the order. (Castillo)
05/10/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/10/2011APPENDIX
06/09/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 7/11/11
06/24/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before July 21, 2011. (Castillo)
07/21/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/21/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/10/2012FiledSubmitted To Fisher,Oberly,King
01/19/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Oberly, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
02/14/2012FiledMandate