judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONNIE LEGETTE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1397
Short Caption:RONNIE LEGETTE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Kidnapping
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-15491-09Filed Date:11/04/2010

Opening Event Date:11/04/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/02/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:04/25/2012
Argued/Submitted:12/11/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonnie Legette Y
James W. KleinNY
Christine A. Monta YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Chrisellen R. KolbYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/04/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/22/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/13/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed)
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (44 pgs/Armstrong) 7/26/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (130 pgs/Armstrong) 7/27/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (168 pgs/Armstrong) 7/28/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (163 pgs/Wood) 7/29/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (136 pgs/Wood) 7/30/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (222 pgs/Walker) 8/2/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (67 pgs/Walker) 8/3/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (11 pgs/Hunt) 8/4/10 proc.
02/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (20 pgs/Jeon) 10/8/10 proc. cd attached
02/02/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/08/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/08/2011RECORD INDEX
02/08/2011RECORD COPIES
02/08/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (SEALED pleadings)
03/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
03/28/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 20, 2011. (JAC)
06/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
06/28/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 19, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (Castillo)
09/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - for 90 days (Appellant)
09/27/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 12/19/11
12/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until March 19, 2012 (Appellant)
12/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file brief and limited appendix by 3/8/12.
01/24/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
01/24/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
02/22/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/02/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 4/25/12.
03/21/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (212 pgs/Wycoff) 7/26/10 proc.
03/21/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #12 (94 pgs/Wycoff) 7/27/10 proc w/cd
04/25/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
04/25/2012FiledBriefing Completed
05/22/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/02/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/13/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
07/18/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
11/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/20/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/29/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
11/29/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
12/11/2012FiledArgued Before Fisher,Thompson,King. Chrsitine A. Monta Esq.,for appellant, Chrisellen R. Kolb Esq.,for appellee.
01/31/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
06/20/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
06/26/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc Other (Appellant)Granted
07/09/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to file petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 9/2/13.
08/30/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
09/04/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to October 2, 2013.
09/27/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
12/17/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
01/08/2014FiledMandate