judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS, JR. (OSCAR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34857
Short Caption:WILLIAMS, JR. (OSCAR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 16921 , 35368 , 39244 , 40403 , 51721 , 53771 , 54156 , 55320 , 67627 , 67627-COA , 73849 , 73849-COA , 80666 , 80666-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C066690Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/05/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08932
11/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal due: 120 days. fn2[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court]. 99-10877
11/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: October 27, 1999, and Notice of Entry of Order filed on October 28, 1999. 99-11453
01/07/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Appeals and to Extend Court Appointed Representation to Consolidated Appeal. Nos. 34857 and 35368. 00-00279
02/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Show Cause and Granting Motion in Part. Appellant seeks consolidation of the appeals in Docket Nos. 34857 and 35368 because these appeals involve the same issues. We grant appellant's motion, in part, and hereby extend the district court's order appointing counsel to apply to the appeal in Docket No. 34587. We decline to consolidate these matters at this time. Appellant's counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why Docket No. 35368 should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. We suspend the briefing schedule in Docket No. 35368. Because appellant is now represented by counsel in Docket No. 34857, we vacate that portion of our order of November 5, 1999, in that matter directing the clerk of the district court to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial record. Resolution of the motion to consolidate is deferred pending this court's receipt and consideration of a response to this show cause order. Nos. 34857, 35368. 00-01766
02/07/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. August 20, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: James A. Helleso. 00-01942
02/23/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. 00-02865
02/23/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to have Record in case number 35368 transferred to case no. 34857. 00-02866
02/23/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order to Show Cause and Granting Motion in Part (nos. 34857/35368). 00-02867
03/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We deny appellant's motion to consolidate. " . . . we dismiss the appeal in docket No. 35368." On Febryary 23, 2000, appellant filed a motion to have the record in Docket No. 35368 transferred to Docket No. 34857. We deny appellant's motion. Docket No. 34857: appellant shall have to and including March 24, 2000, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31. Appellant shall file a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request in this court within 10 days from the date of this order. Nos. 34857, 35368. 00-04248
03/17/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. 00-03717
03/17/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-03718
04/11/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-05778
04/11/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-05779
04/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file the transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 00-06393
04/26/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/10/99. To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 00-06764
04/26/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-06792
05/05/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 5/4/00. 00-07398
05/05/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 00-07399
05/05/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 26, 2000, appellant filed a transcript request form and a response to the order to show cause to the order. It appears that the opening brief, the answering brief, and the reply brief only cite to the August 20, 1999, transcript as it is paginated in appellant's appendix. It appears no other transcripts need be requested or filed in this matter. We wiave the requirements of NRAP 9 and 30, in relation to the August 20, 1999 transcript cited in the briefs and included in appellant's appendix. 00-10698
12/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We hereby "AFFIRM the order of the district court." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 00-21578
01/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21791
01/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2001. 00-21791