judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHEPHERD OF THE VALLEY CARE CENTER v. REBECCA K. FULMER

Case Heading (S-10-0236)
Case Number:S-10-0236Case Docketed On:11/02/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:SHEPHERD OF THE VALLEY CARE CENTER v. REBECCA K. FULMER
Full Title:SHEPHERD OF THE VALLEY CARE CENTER, Appellant (Respondent), v. REBECCA K. FULMER, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShepherd of the Valley Care CenterScott P. Klosterman
AppelleeRebecca K. FulmerPeter James Timbers

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2012 WY 12
Citation:269 P.3d 432

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/02/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/02/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/19/2010Motion - Dismiss partyMotionDismiss partyFinal
11/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee/Respondent's motion to dismiss it from the appeal and to amend the case caption; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2010Order - Granting Motion to Dismiss Appellee/Respondent from Appeal (Caption amended to reflect change)OrderGrantFinal
12/20/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/07/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/25/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/28/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/07/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/02/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/03/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
02/06/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Opportunity to Object and Petition for Attorney's FeesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2012Event - E-mail 02/06/2012 from Appellant re replacement pages to motion. Advised any changes to efiled document must be made through system.EventE-mail correspondenceFinal
02/22/2012Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
02/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/22/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/22/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/27/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/24/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal