judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00175-CR
08-81-00175-CR
10/22/1981
Other Felony
Rico, Albert M. Sr.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
09/21/1983Order enteredDismissed
09/21/1983Judgment IssuedDismissed
09/21/1983Mandate Issued
09/21/1983Submission
09/21/1983Submitted
09/21/1983Case ready to be set
11/04/1981Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/22/1981Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
10/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/21/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
41st District Court
El Paso