judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00040-CV
09-81-00040-CV
10/22/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Sue, et al Alvin Charles
Republic National Bank of Houston
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/14/1983Case stored
03/14/1983Mandate Issued
01/27/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/18/1981Brief Filed
10/27/1981Brief Filed
10/22/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/22/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/14/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
Honorable Larry Gist
80 14083A