judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS VS. STATE

Case Information: 32253
Short Caption:WILLIAMS VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32207 , 39426 , 44072 , 44215 , 47252 , 49862 , 50074 , 55304 , 57849 , 61691 , 62871 , 64268 , 73691
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C108502Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/29/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/29/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
04/30/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter: Tom Mercer and Robert Mintun.
06/24/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the docketing statement or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against appellant's counsel.
06/24/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
08/25/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 25, 1998.
09/25/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
09/25/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time, to and including October 26, 1998, to file the opening brief. We do not expect further requests for extension of time absent and unforeseeable circumstances.
10/22/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
11/23/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
12/29/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant the motions filed November 20, 1998, and November 23, 1998. We deny as moot the motions for extension of time filed on October 22, 1998, in both above-entitled matters. Counsel for appellants in the above-entitled matters shall, within 45 days from the date of this order, file and serve the opening briefs and appendices. Any further requests for extensions of time in either of these matters will likely result in the imposition of sanctions against the office of the Special Public Defender (nos. 31857/32253).
02/16/1999MotionFiled Motion. Emergency Motion to Allow Appellant to Refer to the Record on Appeal in Co-Defendant Robert Byford's Supreme Court Appeal and to hold appeal in abeyance until such time as the Supreme Court can rule on said Emergency Motion.
03/09/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to refer to the opening brief to the record on appeal filed in no. 32207. We deny appellant's motion. Appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, serve and file the opening brief and appendix. fn1[Appellant in docket no. 32253 and appellant in docket no. 32207 were co-defendants in the district court].
03/25/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 41 pages.
03/25/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: express mail.
03/25/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 9.
04/26/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages.
04/26/1999BriefReceived Answering Brief.
04/26/1999AppendixReceived Appendix to Answering Brief.
05/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant respondent's April 26, 1999, motion to file a 57 page answering brief. The clerk shall forthwith file respondent's answering brief and appendix, provisionally submitted with the motion. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to serve and file a reply brief.
05/05/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief.
05/05/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief.
05/26/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 25, 1999.
06/28/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: express-no postmark.
06/09/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-09729
07/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11425
07/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/19/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Application for Extension of Time Within Which to file Petition for Rehearing and Motion to Recall Remittitur. 00-12457
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2000. REMITTITUR RECALLED 01/18/01 ORDER. 00-11425
01/18/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On July 19, 2000, appellant filed a motion to recall the remittitur and for an extension of time within which to file a petition for rehearing. Cause appearing we grant the unopposed motion. We hereby recall the remittitur in this matter. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a petition for rehearing. 01-01091
02/07/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: Express Mail (served on 2/2/01). 01-02459
04/12/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[Appellant's counsel cites an incorrect standard for rehearing taken from former NRAP 40. We direct counsel henceforth to employ the current rule, which was amended in January 1999 and again in August 2000.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 01-06343
04/30/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-06408
04/30/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 7, 2001. 01-06408