judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: DORIS K. NAGEL

Case Information: 10-BG-1388
Short Caption:IN RE: DORIS K. NAGELClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN215-10Filed Date:11/08/2010

Opening Event Date:11/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentDoris K. Nagel NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/08/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of Illinois imposing a stayed suspension upon respondent. Respondent was administratively suspended by the D.C. Bar on November 30, 1998, for failure to pay dues and to file the required registration statement, and remains suspended.
12/06/2010ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of Illinois imposing a stayed suspension upon respondent, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why she should not be suspended from the practice of law for one year with a fitness requirwment, with the suspension stayed in its entirety by a two year period of probation subject to the conditions imposed in Illinois. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with the relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes tthe imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. (ETW)
01/20/2011STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline.
01/21/2011TMC - NOTICE OF RECIPROCAL DISCIPLINE - OTSC - statement of Bar Counsel - proposed order
02/10/2011SUSPENSION ORDERED that Doris K. Nagel, Esquire, is hereby suspended for a period of one year with a fitness requirement, however, that suspension is hereby stayed pending respondent's successful completion of the probationary period imposed by Illinois. (BR,TE,FA)