judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

VANN RIPP MARTIN v. EXECUTIVE SPORTSMAN ASSOCIATION, INC.

Case: B-1383
B-1383
02/13/1969
Application for Writ of Error
VANN RIPP MARTIN
EXECUTIVE SPORTSMAN ASSOCIATION, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/09/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/14/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
02/13/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/17/1969Response to Motion filed
04/09/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/14/1969Response to Petition
02/17/1969Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
02/13/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/13/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Vann Ripp MartinPetitioner
Executive Sportsman Association, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information