judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00358-CR
04-81-00358-CR
10/22/1981
Burglary
Palacios, Jose Angel
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/02/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
11/14/1983Mandate Issued
11/14/1983Mandate Issued
09/21/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/21/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/20/1983Submission
04/20/1983Submission
04/20/1983Submitted
10/22/1981Brief Filed
10/22/1981Record Filed
10/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/16/1981Case ready to be set
10/16/1981Brief Filed
10/16/1981Case ready to be set
08/26/1981Record Approved
01/30/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
79th Judicial District Court
Jim Wells
Honorable Peter Michael Curry
4134
5 Years