judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00029-CV
09-81-00029-CV
10/21/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Rattan Furniture Shop, Inc.
Citizen's & So. Realty Investors, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/01/1982Mandate Issued
04/08/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/22/1982Submitted
01/26/1982Submission
10/21/1981Brief Filed
10/21/1981Brief Filed
10/21/1981No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/01/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris
Honorable Donald Floyd
1,112,365