judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00026-CV
09-81-00026-CV
10/21/1981
Other Personal Injury
Hi-Vac Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Milligan, James, et ux
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/13/1982Mandate Issued
06/02/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/28/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/13/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/22/1982Submitted
01/26/1982Submission
10/21/1981Brief Filed
10/21/1981Brief Filed
10/21/1981Supplemental Transcript filed
10/21/1981No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/13/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
Honorable Joe Ned Dean
80-36322 A