judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00065-CR
09-81-00065-CR
10/21/1981
Burglary
Helton, Stephen L.
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/29/1984Mandate Issued
06/13/1984Petition for ReviewAffirmed
09/15/1982Petition for ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
06/18/1982Petition for Review
05/26/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/17/1982Submitted
10/21/1981Brief Filed
10/21/1981Brief Filed
10/21/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/29/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
128th District Court
Orange
Honorable Patrick Clark
A10,395
60 years TDC