judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00041-CV
09-81-00041-CV
10/21/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Coffey, Ann
Beckman Office Supply Co., et al
No
1st Court of Appeals
10/21/1981
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/29/1982Mandate Issued
08/05/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/24/1982Submitted
02/26/1982Brief Filed
01/26/1982Submission
12/26/1981Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/04/1981Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/21/1981Brief Filed
10/21/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/29/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
Honorable Larry Gist
1,023,002