judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00043-CV
09-81-00043-CV
10/21/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Motard, Rodolphe L.
The Chemshare Corporation, et al
No
14th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/21/1988Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
05/07/1987Letter
04/07/1983Case stored
04/07/1983Mandate Issued
01/26/1983No Description Available.Refused
10/28/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/09/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed in part; /Reversed & Rendered in part
10/21/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
09/08/1981Brief Filed
08/12/1981Brief Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
1,087,066