judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-81-01072-CR
05-81-01072-CR
10/22/1981
Poss of a Controlled Substance
David Lee Langley
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/21/2017Order enteredDestroy
05/25/2017Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
12/14/1984Mandate Issued
10/16/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/10/1984Case Returned from Higher Ct.
06/01/1984Mandate IssuedReversed & Remanded to Ct. App
07/18/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
06/17/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/15/1983Response to Motion
05/18/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/04/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/05/1983Submitted
03/08/1983Submission
02/28/1983Brief Filed
12/15/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/17/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/17/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/25/1982Brief Filed
08/25/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/12/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
05/10/1982Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp
04/05/1982Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/1982Transcript Filed
10/22/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/21/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Langley, David LeeCriminal - Appellant
The State of Texas Criminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
283rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 283rd District Court
F81-6518-NIT
5 yrs tdc