judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00024-CV
09-81-00024-CV
10/21/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Friday, A. Randall
Allen, John C., et ux
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/28/1982Mandate Issued
06/10/1982Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
03/22/1982Submitted
01/26/1982Submission
10/21/1981Supplemental Brief Filed
10/21/1981Brief Filed
10/21/1981Brief Filed
10/21/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/28/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Civil Court at Law No 2
Harris
Honorable Monte D. Lawlis
384,344