judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TURNER VS. MERCY AMBULANCE

Case Information: 31244
Short Caption:TURNER VS. MERCY AMBULANCECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A312314Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/30/1997 / Earl, AllanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/10/2000 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/10/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/22/1997Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200 from Geraldine Kirk-Hughes-check no. 5841.
10/22/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
10/30/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Allan Earl. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/13/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
12/09/1997Other Other. Filed Certified Copy of Second Amended Notice of Appeal. (per AH)
12/12/1997Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
12/16/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. To Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due date: 10 days.
12/26/1997Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. From Attorney Geraldine Kirk-Hughes re: payment of filing fees.
01/28/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On December 16, 1997, we issued a notice to appellant directing her to pay the filing fee within ten days. On December 24, 1997, in reponse to the notice, we received a letter from appellant's counsel stating that appellant paid a filing fee when the first notice of appeal was filed. Appellant is required to submit a filing fee with the second notice of appeal as well. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to submit the required filing fee or risk the imposition of sanctions.
02/04/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200 from Geraldine Kirk-Hughes--check no. 6224.
02/11/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. It appears that this court may lack jurisdiction over the portion of this appeal from the district court's order awarding sanctions against counsel for appellant. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why the portion of this appeal from the district court's order awarding sanctions against counsel for appellant should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule and preparation of transcripts in this appeal shall remain suspended.
02/20/1998MotionFiled Motion. To Dismiss Appeals.
02/25/1998Other Other. Filed Appellant's Reply to Court's Order of February 11, 1998.
03/05/1998MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondents' Motions to Dismiss Appeals and Appellant's Countermotion to have Amended Notice of Appeal filed Nunc Pro Tunc.
03/16/1998MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents' Opposition to Countermotion to have Amended Notice of Appeal filed Nunc Pro Tunc. (o.k. to file per A.H.)
03/23/1998Other Other. Returned, unfiled, Appellant's Reply to Respondents' Opposition to appellant's Countermotion to Have Amended Notice of Appeal filed Nunc Pro Tunc.
04/01/1998Other Other. Filed Appellant's Request to File Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Countermotion to Have Amended Notice of Appeal filed Nunc Pro Tunc.
04/01/1998Other Other. Received Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Appellants' Countermotion to Have Amended Notice of Appeal filed Nunc Pro Tunc.
06/08/1998MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion Requesting Court to Issue a Briefing Schedule.
09/08/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We grant respondents' motion to dismiss this appeal with respect to the portion of the appeal from the order granting partial summary judgment. The appeal from the September 22, 1997 order of dismissal, September 29, 1997 order denying appellant's motion to set aside the judgment, October 6, 1997 order denying appellant's demand for a jury trial, and the November 7, 1997 order awarding costs to respondent, may now proceed. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 15 days form the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a). Appellant shall have 120 days rom the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 1[We grant appellant's motion to file a reply to respondents' opposition to appellant's motion. We direct the clerk to file appellant's reply received on April 1, 1998. In light of this order, we deny as moot appellant's motion requesting this court to file the October 28, 1997 notice of appeal Nunc Pro Tunc and appellant's motion to issue a briefing schedule.]
09/08/1998Other Other. Filed Appellant's Reply to Respondents' Opposition to Appellant's Countermotion to have Amended Notice of Appeal filed Nunc Pro Tunc.
09/23/1998Other Other. Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings: Court Reporter: Laurie Webb.
10/02/1998Other Other. Filed Supplement to Request for Transcript of Proceedings.
10/09/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified copies of Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings dated: June 24, 1997; August 4, 1997; September 15, 1997; September 29, 1997. Court Reporters: Theresa A. Lanza; Sheri Maloof-Thompson; Tyrone LaRue: Marilyn Waggoner.
11/13/1998MotionFiled Motion. To Enlarge Time to File Answering Brief.
01/11/1999MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time in Which to File Opening Brief and Page Extension of Appendix. (Mailed on: 1/8/99)
01/11/1999BriefReceived Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief (Mailed on: 1/8/99).
01/11/1999AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Appendix (Mailed on: 1/8/99).
01/19/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant's January 11, 1999, motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall forthwith file the opening brief and appendix submitted with the motion. Respondents previous motion to enlarge time to file the answering brief is granted. Respondents' answering brief shall be served and filed no later than march 15, 1999.
01/19/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
01/19/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
03/16/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: No postmark).
03/16/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondents' Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2. (Mailed on: No postmark.)
03/19/1999Other Other. Addendum to Respondents' Brief.
04/20/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 4/16/99).
04/20/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Reply Appendix.
12/03/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 10, 2000 at the hour of 11:00 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas. (SNP99B-WM, MS, NB)
12/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral argument reminder notice.
01/10/2000Other Other. Oral argument before the Southern Nevada Panel: submitted. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
01/10/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/18/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Change of Address for attorney R. Richard Costello.
02/04/2000MotionFiled Motion. Requesting Leave to File Supplement in Answer to Misrepresentations by Opposing Counsel at Oral Argument and for Sanctions for This Intentional Misrepresentation of the Fact to this Court.
02/04/2000Other Other. Received Appellant's Supplement Refuting Misrepresentations by Opposing Counsel at Oral Argument and Requesting Sanctions.
02/10/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Enlarge Time to Oppose Appellant's Motion Requesting Leave to File Supplement in Answer to Misrepresentations by Opposing Counsel at Oral Argument and for Sanctions for Misrepresentation of Fact.
03/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On February 4, 2000, appellant filed a motion seeking leave to file a supplement addressing alleged misrepresentations made by respondents' counsel at argument and seeking sanctions for those alleged misrepresentations. We grant appellant's motion, in part, and direct the clerk to forthwith file the supplement provisionally received on February 4, 2000. Respondents' counsel shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve an answer to the supplement. Fn1[Counsel's February 10, 2000, motion for an extension of time to oppose the supplement is denied as moot.]
03/10/2000Other Other. Filed Appellant's Supplement Refuting Misrepresentations by Opposing Counsel at Oral Argument and Requesting Sanctions.
03/21/2000Other Other. Filed Respondents' Answer to Appellant's Supplement Refuting Misrepresentations by Opposing Counsel at Oral Argument and Opposition to Request for Sanctions. (Mailed on: FedEx 3/20/00).
04/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. " we ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-06833
05/23/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-08592
05/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 25, 2000. 00-08592