judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROCKIES EXPRESS PIPELINE, LLC fka ENTREGA GAS PIPELINE, LLC and KINDER MORGAN NATGAS OPERATOR, LLC, both organized under the laws of Delaware v. BERTHEL LAND AND LIVESTOCK, a Wyoming Limited Partnership

Case Heading (S-10-0228)
Case Number:S-10-0228Case Docketed On:10/25/2010
Linked To: S-10-0227
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:ROCKIES EXPRESS PIPELINE, LLC fka ENTREGA GAS PIPELINE, LLC and KINDER MORGAN NATGAS OPERATOR, LLC, both organized under the laws of Delaware v. BERTHEL LAND AND LIVESTOCK, a Wyoming Limited Partnership
Full Title:ROCKIES EXPRESS PIPELINE, LLC fka ENTREGA GAS PIPELINE, LLC and KINDER MORGAN NATGAS OPERATOR, LLC, both organized under the laws of Delaware, Appellants (Defendants) v. BERTHEL LAND AND LIVESTOCK, a Wyoming Limited Partnership, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRockies Express Pipeline, LLCDavid G. Ditto
AppellantKinder Morgan Natgas Operator, LLCDavid G. Ditto
AppelleeBerthel Land and Livestock, a Wyoming limited partnershipWilliam G. Hibbler

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2012 WY 52
Citation:275 P.3d 423

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/25/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/25/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/09/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Cross Appellant and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/03/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's motion for extension of time in which to file brief of appellee; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/16/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of cross-appellee; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/22/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bill Hibbler for Berthel Land and Livestock.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - DAvid G. Ditto for Rockies Express Pipeline, LLC.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (William G. Hibbler for Berthel Land and Livestock; David G. Ditto for appellees Rockies Express Pipeline, LLC, et al.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/17/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, eight volumes. Volumes I-VI, Original Papers; Volume VII, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/10/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/26/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/26/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/01/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 4/30/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal