judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-81-00025-CV
02-81-00025-CV
10/21/1981
Workers Compensation
Burns, Terry L.
United States Fire Insurance Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/17/1982Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/15/1982Order EnteredReversed & Remanded to Trial Court
10/08/1982Writ Filed
09/09/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/12/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
141st District Court
Tarrant
Honorable R. T. Driver
141-63217-80