judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-81-00313-CR
02-81-00313-CR
10/22/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Ashby, Douglas Loring
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/1983Writ of Certiorari
09/26/1983Writ Filed
07/20/1983Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/15/1983Motion Filed
06/15/1983Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
04/04/1983Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Tarrant
Honorable Clyde R. Ashworth
25395
Life, TDC