judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-82-00030-CV
10-82-00030-CV
03/04/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Manufactured Housing Management Corporation
Albert Tubb, et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/13/2001Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
03/28/1983Case stored
03/28/1983Mandate issued by this Court
11/18/1982Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
10/07/1982Submitted
03/04/1982Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/13/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
87th District Court
Leon
3109-B