judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00028-CV
09-81-00028-CV
10/21/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Temple, Gaston, et al
Dull, John, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/05/1982Mandate Issued
09/09/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/24/1982Supplemental Transcript filed
08/24/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/24/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/18/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
06/29/1982No Description Available.
06/29/1982No Description Available.
03/22/1982Submitted
01/26/1982Submission
01/07/1982No Description Available.Overruled
12/30/1981No Description Available.
12/30/1981Brief Filed
11/24/1981Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/05/1981Brief Filed
10/26/1981Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/21/1981No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/05/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
151st District Court
Harris
Honorable Monte D. Lawlis
78-24278