judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00027-CV
09-81-00027-CV
10/21/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Tarkenton, Richard L.
Ravensway - Saracen Park Home Association
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/04/1983Mandate Issued
02/04/1983Case Returned from Higher Ct.
01/12/1983Writ DisposedRefused
10/18/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/18/1982Writ Filed
09/16/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/16/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/12/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/22/1982Submitted
01/26/1982Submission
10/21/1981Brief Filed
10/21/1981Brief Filed
10/21/1981Supplemental Transcript filed
10/21/1981No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/04/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris
Honorable Britton E. Plunk
78-37353