judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DDX J. OBUSZEWSKI V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CT-1410
Short Caption:DDX J. OBUSZEWSKI V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - DC Non-Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CDC26093-06Filed Date:11/05/2010

Opening Event Date:11/05/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMax J. Obuszewski Y
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/05/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/24/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed EITHER as having been IMPROPERLY FILED OR DISMISSED as appellant is NOT AGGRIEVED by the October 7, 2010 order, since the Contempt charge against him has been dismissed. (BY: ETW)
11/24/2010TMC - OTSC
01/11/2011 On consideration of this court 11/24/10 order directing appellant to show cause why this appeal from the 10/7/10 finding of contempt should not be dismissed having been improperly filed since the NOA IS UNSIGNED, NO RESPONSE HAVING BEEN FILED and it appearing that appellant has not corrected promptly the NOA by signing it, it is ORDERED that the NOA IS STRICKEN AND DISMISSED as having been IMPROPERLY FILED. See DC App. R. 4 (c)(2). (RZTEFA) (rl)
01/11/2011STRICKEN & DISMISSED
02/02/2011MANDATE ISSUED