judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PORTER VS. CAVALLO

Case Information: 34861
Short Caption:PORTER VS. CAVALLOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9406798Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/1999 / Recanzone, MarioSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Joe E. Colvin-check no. 1677.
09/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09000
09/30/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Mario G. Recanzone. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/01/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 on cross-appeal from Law Offices of Haefner & Enzenberger--check no. 6273.
10/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 99-09475
10/08/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
01/04/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-00111
01/10/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-00409
01/14/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-00632
01/21/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Respondent/cross-appellant: 15 days to filed the docketing statement; 70 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for respondent/cross-appellant). 00-00977
02/01/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/cross-appellant. 00-01607
02/15/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-02413
03/28/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 3/28/00 (Reno/Carson). 00-04982
04/20/2000MotionFiled Motion. Request for Reinstatement of Settlement Conference Proceedings. 00-06341
04/26/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 30, 2000. 00-06750
04/27/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Response to Motion for Enlargement of Time re: Answering Brief. 00-06891
05/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant respondent's April 20, 2000 motion to reinstate settlement proceedings and suspend the briefing schedule. Settlement Judge Mario G. Recanzone shll have 30 days from the date of this order to schedule another settlement conference. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. 00-08305
06/22/2000MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion to Reinstate Briefing Schedule. 00-10712
06/27/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's Motion Reinstate Briefing Schedule. 00-10956
07/07/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter, original and three copies of the Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Reinstate Briefing Schedule.
07/13/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Appellant's Request for Permission to file Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Reinstate Briefing Schedule. 00-12128
08/04/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Request for Permission to file Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Reinstate Briefing Schedule. 00-13545
09/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. Cause appearing, we grant Joy Porter's motion to reinstate the briefing schedule. Donald Cavallo shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file with this court a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request. Cavallo shall have 30 days from the date this order within which to file and serve a combined opening brief and answering brief on cross-appeal. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Fn1[We deny as moot Porter's July 13, 2000 motion to file a reply in support of her motion to reinstate briefing]. 00-16636
09/28/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Cross-Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-17143
10/12/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 20, 2000. 00-18132
11/09/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-19715
11/17/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opposition to Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-20218
11/17/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 11/17/00. 00-20242
01/02/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. 01-00063
01/09/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal and Cross Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. fn1[Respondent/cross-appellant's motion to dismiss appeal filed on November 9, 2000 is denied as moot.] SNP/CLK 01-00406
01/09/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.