judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSHUA KENT COLLINGS v. ALAN LORDS

Case Heading (S-08-0225)
Case Number:S-08-0225Case Docketed On:10/08/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:JOSHUA KENT COLLINGS v. ALAN LORDS
Full Title:JOSHUA KENT COLLINGS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ALAN LORDS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoshua Kent CollingsMark W Harris
AppelleeAlan LordsRaymond W. Martin

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Negligence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 135
Citation:218 P.3d 654

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/08/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/08/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/06/2008Motion - Withdrawal of counsel from Marvin L. TylerMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
11/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Raymond W. Martin to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
11/06/2008Order - Other - allowing withdrawal of counselOrderOtherFinal
11/19/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/21/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion for extension of time to file brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/21/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/09/2008Brief - Appellant (appendix is on on hard copies only)BriefAppellantFinal
12/09/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant with appendix; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/22/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/11/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Raymond W. Martin for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/19/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
02/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/20/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received motion to vacate and reset oral argumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
03/16/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Raymond Martin for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/25/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mark Harris for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/23/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Mark W. Harris for appellant; Raymond W. Martin for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/23/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/06/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/24/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/24/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/03/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/30/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal